A member of the board of the JSC "Latvijas Krājbanka" Ēvalds Trukšāns has resigned from the board member position of the JSC "Latvijas Krājbanka" and will be working in the "Latvijas Krājbanka" as the Vice President in the IT affairs with the effect 18th July 2007 At the council meeting of the JSC "Latvijas Krājbanka" held on 17 July 2007 changes have been made in the board composition of the JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka”. Two new members of the board have been elected - Ilze Bagatska and Ivars Priedītis both effective from the 18th July, 2007. The work experience of the appointed members of the board during the last three years: Ilze Bagatska: 1999 - until now Latvian Sworn Attorney's Collegium, Sworn Attorney 2002 - until now Certified Bankruptcy process Administrator 15.06.2006 - until now The Head of the Legal Department of the JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka” 15.06.2007 - until now The JSC “LKB Līzings”, Member of the Board Ilzei Bagatska is not the shareholder of the JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka”. Ivars Priedītis: 2003 -2004 IJSC “ERGO Latvijas Dzīvība”, Chairman of the Board 01.07.2004 - 30.06.2007 IJSC “ERGO Latvija”, Member of the Board 01.07.2004 -30.06.2007 IJSC “ERGO Latvijas Dzīvība”, Member of the Board 01.07.2004.-30.06.2007. IJSC “ERGO Igaunija”, Member of the Board 01.07.2004.-30.06.2007. IJSC “ERGO Igaunija Dzīvība”, Member of the Board 01.07.2004.-30.06.2007. IJSC “ERGO Lietuva”, Member of the Board 01.07.2004 - 30.06.2007. IJSC “ERGO Lietuva Dzīvība”, Member of the Board 02.07.2007 - until now JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka”, Vice President Ivars Priedītis is not the shareholder of the JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka”. Mārtiņš Bondars proceeds working as a Chairman of the Board of the JSC “Latvijas Krājbanka“, Dzintars Pelcbergs fulfills the duties of the First Deputy of the Chairman of the Board and Andrejs Surmačs and Svetlana Ovčiņņikova continue working as the members of the board.
Changes in the Board of the JSC "Latvijas Krājbanka"
| Source: Latvijas Krajbanka