ASPO Plc STOCK EXCHANGE BULLETIN October 23, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. The Aspo Plc Board of Directors has appointed the current COO, Aki Ojanen, eMBA, (47), the CEO of Aspo Plc from January 1, 2009. He has worked in his current position and as the deputy CEO since October 1, 2007. Aki Ojanen has been responsible for developing Aspo's business operations and structure and for expanding the operations into the CIS market. Aspo's operations in the CIS market have become significant for the Group in recent years. In addition the company has carried out its history's largest acquisition last spring when acquiring Kauko-Telko Oy. In connection with this the Chairman of the Board of Directors, Kari Stadigh, announced that he will leave his position as the Chairman of the Aspo Plc Board at the end of 2008, and will continue as a member of the Board. The Board of Directors has decided to elect Aspo Plc's current CEO, Gustav Nyberg as the new Chairman of the Board starting January 1, 2009, Nyberg will thus resign as the CEO. Gustav Nyberg, B.Sc. (Econ.), eMBA, (51), has worked as Aspo's CEO since the division of the company in 1999. At the Annual Shareholder's Meeting of 2008, Nyberg was elected as a member to the Board of Directors. Kauko-Telko Oy's CFO and acting President, Arto Meitsalo, M.Sc. (Econ.), (45), has been appointed CFO of Aspo Plc from January 1, 2009. The CFO is also responsible for Group administration and information systems and he also acts as Aspo Plc's Insider Manager. The CFO reports to the CEO. Aspo's current CFO, Dick Blomqvist, M.Sc. (Econ.), who has worked in this position since 1999 and at Aspo Group since 1985, will retire in accordance with his employment contract in the summer of 2009. Director Blomqvist is responsible for the Group's special projects until retirement. He reports to the CEO. Harri Seppälä, eMBA, (44), who was appointed Treasurer of Aspo Plc on April 1, 2008, is responsible for the Group's financing, cash management and currency policy. The Treasurer reports to the CEO. ASPO Plc Board of Directors Gustav Nyberg CEO For more information: Gustav Nyberg, +358 40 503 6420 gustav.nyberg@aspo.fi Aspo is a conglomerate focused on sectors that require extensive specialist knowledge. Aspo owns and develops the leading businesses in its sector, which include ESL Shipping, Leipurin and Telko. In addition, Aspo also includes Kaukomarkkinat, which focuses on selected fields of trade. Aspo serves demanding business-to-business clients. In 2007, the company's net sales (pro forma) amounted to EUR 495.3 million. DISTRIBUTION: NASDAQ OMX Helsinki Key media www.aspo.fi