Correction: additional information on professional experience and shares owned by Ē.Mikštas added AS ”KURZEMES ATSLĒGA 1” (reg.No. 40003044007) informs that there have been changes in the management board on February 5, 2009. Valdis Biķis has left the position of the Chairman of the management board. He was replaced by Ēriks Mikštas. Ēriks Mikštas has been SIA "Prometāls" managing director from 19.06.2003 -06.01.2005, Chairman of the Management Board from 15.06.2005. Ēriks Mikštas has graduated Business School "Turība" in 2002 with specialization in company management, additional specialization - bank specialist. Ē.Mikštas has started studies at Riga Business School for master degree in 2003. Ēriks Mikštas does not own any AS "KURZEMES ATSLĒGA 1" shares. The present management board consists of: Chairman of the Board - Ēriks Mikštas Board members - Aldis Ozols, Ināra Burve AS ''KURZEMES ATSLĒGA 1'' Board