CeoTronics AG / Change of Personnel 01.09.2010 12:12 Dissemination of an Ad hoc announcement according to § 15 WpHG, transmitted by DGAP - a company of EquityStory AG. The issuer is solely responsible for the content of this announcement. --------------------------------------------------------------------------- Rödermark, September 1, 2010: The Board of Management of CeoTronics AG Audio Video Data Communication (ISIN: DE0005407407) announces the following changes in the Supervisory Board: Due to health reason Hans-Dieter Günther, Rödermark, has resigned as a Chairman and member of the Supervisory Board effective August 31, 2010. At his place, Matthias Löw, Rodgau, steps in as an alternate member of the Supervisory Board. The Supervisory Board elected at today's inaugural meeting, until the end of the Annual General Meeting on November 5, 2010, Mr. Matthias Löw, Rodgau, as Chairman and Mr. Horst Schöppner, Rödermark as Deputy Chairman. The Board of Management Further information: CeoTronics AG Audio Video Data Communication Investor Relations, Adam-Opel-Strasse 6, 63322 Rödermark, Germany Tel: +49 6074 8751-722, Fax: +49 6074 8751-720 E-mail: chairman@ceotronics.com, Internet: http://www.ceotronics.com 01.09.2010 12:12 Ad hoc announcement, Financial News and Press Release distributed by DGAP. Medienarchiv at |[![CDATA[|[a href="http://www.dgap-medientreff.de"|]www.dgap-medientreff.de|[/a|]]]|] and |[![CDATA[|[a href="http://www.dgap.de"|]www.dgap.de|[/a|]]]|] --------------------------------------------------------------------------- Language: English Company: CeoTronics AG Adam-Opel-StraÃe 6 63322 Rödermark Deutschland Phone: +49 (0)6074 8751-724 Fax: +49 (0)6074 8751-720 E-mail: investor.relations@ceotronics.com Internet: www.ceotronics.com ISIN: DE0005407407 WKN: 540740 Listed: Regulierter Markt in Frankfurt (Prime Standard); Freiverkehr in Hamburg, München, Düsseldorf, Berlin, Stuttgart End of News DGAP News-Service ---------------------------------------------------------------------------
DGAP-Adhoc: CeoTronics AG: Changes in the Supervisory Board
| Source: EQS Group AG