PKC Group Plc Company Announcement 4 April 2012 3.30 pm
CHANGES IN PKC GROUP’S EXECUTIVE BOARD
As published before, Matti Hyytiäinen is appointed as new President and CEO of PKC Group Plc as of today, following the resignation of Harri Suutari as the President & CEO after his election to the Board of Directors in the Annual General Meeting. Upon Matti Hyytiäinen’s proposal the Board of Directors has appointed PKC Group’s new Executive Board.
The Executive Board shall consist of the following persons as of 4 April 2012:
- Matti Hyytiäinen, President & CEO (Chairman)
and the persons continuing in the Executive Board:
- Harri Ojala, President, Wiring Systems, Europe & APAC
- Sanna Raatikainen, General Counsel
- Jarmo Rajala, President, Electronics
- Marja Sarajärvi, CFO, until 30 June 2012
as well as the persons appointed as new members to the Executive Board:
- Jyrki Keronen, Senior Vice President, Business Development (office in Helsinki, Finland), b. 1966, BSc. Eng., EMBA, with PKC Group since fall 2011
- Frank Sovis, President, Wiring Systems, North America (office in Farmington Hills, Michigan, USA), b. 1961, MBA, BBA, with PKC Group since AEES acquisition.
In addition, the following persons have been appointed to the Executive Board from later dates:
- Pekka Korkala, President, Wiring Systems, South America (office in Curitiba, Paraná, Brazil), b. 1969, M.Sc. (Tech.), as of 1st of May 2012. Korkala transfers to the employ of PKC from his position as a managing director of Lahden Autokori Oy, prior to which he made a long career with PKC.
- Juha Torniainen, CFO (office in Helsinki, Finland), b. 1966, M.Sc. (Econ.), as of 1 July 2012. Torniainen transfers to the employ of PKC from his position as a managing director of Staffpoint Oy, prior to which he made a long career in international financial management e.g. as CFO of Perlos Oyj.
Previous member of the Executive Board, Jarkko Kariniemi, HR Director, shall continue at the employ of the company until 1st of August 2012. Marja Sarajärvi, CFO, shall continue at the employ of the company until 30.6.2012.
PKC Group Plc
Board of Directors
Matti Hyytiäinen
President & CEO
For additional information, contact:
Matti Hyytiäinen, President & CEO, PKC Group Plc, +358 400 710 968
DISTRIBUTION
NASDAQ OMX
Main media
www.pkcgroup.com
The PKC Group offers design and contract manufacturing services for wiring systems and electronics. The Group has production facilities in Brazil, China, Estonia, Finland, Germany, Ireland, Mexico, Poland, Russia, Ukraine and the USA. The Group's net sales in 2011 totalled EUR 550.2 million. PKC Group Plc is listed on NASDAQ OMX Helsinki Ltd.