Vilnius, Lithuania, 2012-04-06 21:55 CEST (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) --
On April 6, 2012 Invalda AB received a notice from Dalius Kaziunas regarding his resignation from the position of the Company‘s Board member position from April 30, 2012.
Dalius Kaziunas has been appointed as a President of Invalda AB since January 1, 2012.
The person authorized to provide additional information:
Dalius Kaziunas
President
Tel. (8 5) 273 3278
Email: dalius@invalda.lt