Conergy AG / Key word(s): Change of Personnel 06.11.2012 15:50 Dissemination of an Ad hoc announcement according to § 15 WpHG, transmitted by DGAP - a company of EquityStory AG. The issuer is solely responsible for the content of this announcement. --------------------------------------------------------------------------- Dr. Philip Comberg appointed Chief Executive Officer. Dr. Andreas Plesske to become Chairman of the Supervisory Board The Supervisory Board of Conergy today appointed Dr. Philip Comberg as Chief Executive Officer (CEO) for three years with effect from 1 January 2013. Comberg has been delegated as CEO in accordance with Section 105 para. 2 sentence 1 of the German Stock Corporation Act (AktG) with effect as of 12 January 2012 until 31 December 2012. Since his delegation his membership in the supervisory board was dormant. In connection with his appointment Dr. Philip Comberg will resign from the Supervisory Board. Within the Management Board he remains in charge of strategy, corporate development, corporate communications, human resources, compliance and legal. Successor as chairman of the supervisory board will be the present deputy chairman, Dr. Andreas Plesske. Contact: Christoph Marx Head of Investor Relations Conergy AG Anckelmannsplatz 1 20537 Hamburg Germany T +49 40 271 42 - 1634 F +49 40 271 42 - 1639 06.11.2012 DGAP's Distribution Services include Regulatory Announcements, Financial/Corporate News and Press Releases. Media archive at www.dgap-medientreff.de and www.dgap.de --------------------------------------------------------------------------- Language: English Company: Conergy AG Anckelmannsplatz 1 20537 Hamburg Germany Phone: +49 (0)40 27 142-1000 Fax: +49 (0)40 27 142-1100 E-mail: info@conergy.de Internet: www.conergy.de ISIN: DE000A1KRCK4 WKN: A1KRCK Listed: Regulierter Markt in Frankfurt (Prime Standard); Freiverkehr in Berlin, Düsseldorf, Hamburg, Hannover, München, Stuttgart End of Announcement DGAP News-Service ---------------------------------------------------------------------------
DGAP-Adhoc: Conergy AG: Dr. Philip Comberg appointed Chief Executive Officer. Dr. Andreas Plesske to become Chairman of the Supervisory Board
| Source: EQS Group AG